List of oau secretary generals
The OAU had five major institutions, namely, the Assembly of Heads of State and Government, the Council of Ministers, the General Secretariat , the Commission on …
- Safe
- Netherlands
- Encrypted
- 15 yrs old
- 222 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
Trends
Below is the list of the Past Secretary-Generals of The Organization of African Unity (OAU) 1. Diallo Telli of Guinea (1963-1972) 2. Ezo Ekangaki of Cameroon …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 24 yrs old
- 32 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
The outgoing Secretary-General, Mr. Salim Ahmed Salim, has transformed the OAU in the 12 years of his tenure. Under his dynamic leadership, the OAU has …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 29 yrs old
- 213 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
This is a list of former Secretaries General of the Organization of African Unity (OAU) 1. Diallo Telli of Guinea (1963-1972) 2. Ezo Ekangaki of Cameroon (1972-1974) 3. William …
- Safe
- Encrypted
9. Trygve Lie. Trvgne Lie was a Norwegian diplomat born on July 16, 1896, in Oslo. He attended Oslo University for his law degree. After holding various positions in …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 28 yrs old
- 5,018 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
H.E. Mr Georges Rebelo Pinto Chikoti was elected as the new Secretary-General of the Organisation of African, Caribbean and Pacific States (OACPS), formerly the ACP Group …
- Safe
- Encrypted
Kenneth J. Zellers, Commissioner. Kenneth (Ken) J. Zellers was confirmed by the Missouri Senate on March 10, 2022 as the Commissioner of the Missouri Office of Administration. …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 2,897 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
The Commissioner of Administration is appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate, and serves as the Chief Administrative Officer with oversight of …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 2,897 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
No. Portrait Chairperson Took office Left office Country Region 1: Haile Selassie: 25 May 1963: 17 July 1964 Ethiopia East Africa: 2: Gamal Abdel Nasser: 17 July 1964: 21 …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 23 yrs old
- 13 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
We’re tracking the results of the Texas 2024 primary election happening March 5. Texas voters will choose party nominees for statewide seats, including governor, U.S. …
- Safe
- United States
- Encrypted
- 16 yrs old
- 6,301 Site Rank
- Report Card
- Site Info
- Domain Check
- Site Overview
{{domain}}
WEBSITE REPORT CARD
WEBSITE REPORT CARD
-
Norton safe Web
-
McAfee Web Advisor
-
Site is
-
Hosted in
-
-
Traffic rank:
-
Site age:
-
Site Owner information